MT HB8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-01 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable resource bonds and loans
Title
Renewable resource bonds and loans
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Cook [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-05-01 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | (C) Special Note | |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Reconsidered Previous Action; Remains in 2nd Reading Process |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopt Motion Failed |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-27 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-03-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-03-25 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-03-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-11 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-11 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Joint Appropriations Subcommittee on Long-Range Planning |
2013-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2012-12-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2012-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2012-12-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-12-12 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-12-07 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2012-12-07 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-05-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Appropriations
Appropriations, Coal Tax Fund Principal
Bond Issues, Public
Debt, Creation of State
Energy
Environmental Protection
Water
Appropriations, Coal Tax Fund Principal
Bond Issues, Public
Debt, Creation of State
Energy
Environmental Protection
Water