MT HB73 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to classification of certain public defender employees
Title
Revise laws related to classification of certain public defender employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-03-18 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-19 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-02-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2019-01-29 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-01-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Appropriations |
2019-01-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-17 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-12-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2018-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-12-07 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-12-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-12-03 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2018-11-26 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-08-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |