MT HB70 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increase the amount of green timber that can be harvested by commercial permit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase the amount of green timber that can be harvested by commercial permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Chapter Number Assigned
2019-03-20House(H) Signed by Governor
2019-03-19House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-18Senate(S) Signed by President
2019-03-15House(H) Signed by Speaker
2019-03-13 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2019-03-13House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2019-03-12House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2019-03-11Senate(S) Returned to House
2019-03-11Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2019-03-11Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-03-09Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2019-03-09Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-02-19Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources
2019-02-18Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Natural Resources
2019-02-15Senate(S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources
2019-02-11Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources
2019-02-11Senate(S) First Reading
2019-02-08House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2019-02-08House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2019-02-08House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-02-07House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-02-07House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-02-05House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources
2019-02-04House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources
2019-02-01House(H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources
2019-01-08House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2019-01-07House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2019-01-07House(H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources
2019-01-07House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2018-12-17House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2018-12-15House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources
2018-12-12 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2018-12-12House(H) Introduced
2018-12-04 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2018-12-04 (C) Draft in Assembly
2018-12-04 (C) Executive Director Review
2018-12-04 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2018-12-04 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2018-12-03 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2018-12-03 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2018-11-30 (C) Draft in Edit
2018-11-29 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-11-29 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2018-11-21 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-11-12 (C) Draft On Hold
2018-09-17 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=70&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0099/HB0070_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0099/HB0070_x.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0070NAH190204.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H313&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H334&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0070NAS190218.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S721&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S744&P_SESS=20191

Bill Comments 750

feedback