MT HB70 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise vote by mail laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise vote by mail laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-27House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2015-01-27House(H) Hearing Canceled (H) State Administration
2015-01-27House(H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b)
2015-01-06House(H) Fiscal Note Printed (H) State Administration
2015-01-05House(H) Fiscal Note Signed (H) State Administration
2015-01-05House(H) First Reading
2015-01-02House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2014-12-23House(H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration
2014-12-15House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2014-12-10 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2014-12-10House(H) Introduced
2014-12-08 (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
2014-12-08 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2014-12-08 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2014-12-03 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2014-12-03 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2014-11-26 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2014-11-21 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2014-11-21 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2014-11-14 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-11-06 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2014-09-15 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-06-11 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback