MT HB695 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise environmental laws
Title
Generally revise environmental laws
Sponsors
Rep. Denley Loge [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Pass Consideration |
2021-04-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2021-04-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-04-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-06 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-06 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-01 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-03-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-26 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-03-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-03-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-03-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-03-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-03-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-29 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-10-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |