MT HB683 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Distribute recreational marijuana revenue to unfunded pension liability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribute recreational marijuana revenue to unfunded pension liability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29Senate(S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
2021-04-12Senate(S) Tabled in Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
2021-04-12Senate(S) Hearing (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
2021-04-12House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2021-04-12 (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned
2021-04-12House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2021-04-09Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Select Committee on Marijuana Law
2021-04-08House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2021-04-08Senate(S) First Reading
2021-04-07 (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned
2021-04-07House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-04-07House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-04-07House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-04-06House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations
2021-04-06House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations
2021-04-06House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2021-04-06House(H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
2021-04-06House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2021-04-01House(H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2021-04-01House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-04-01House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-03-31House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation
2021-03-31House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation
2021-03-31House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-03-31House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-03-31House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-03-31House(H) Hearing (H) Taxation
2021-03-25House(H) First Reading
2021-03-25House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation
2021-03-24 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-03-24House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-03-24House(H) Introduced
2021-03-22 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-03-22 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-03-22 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-03-22 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-03-22 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-03-22 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-03-22 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-03-22 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-03-22 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-03-20 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-03-19 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-03-19 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-03-19 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2021-03-17 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2020-11-10 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback