MT HB680 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require collection and mapping of mental health workforce data

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require collection and mapping of mental health workforce data

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29House(H) Died in Process
2021-04-08House(H) Missed Deadline for Appropriation Bill Transmittal
2021-03-31House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services
2021-03-31House(H) Hearing (H) Human Services
2021-03-30House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-03-30 (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned
2021-03-29House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-03-24House(H) First Reading
2021-03-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services
2021-03-24 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-03-24House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-03-24House(H) Introduced
2021-03-24 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-03-23 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-03-23 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-03-23 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-03-23 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-03-23 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-03-23 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-03-23 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-03-22 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-03-22 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2021-03-22 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-03-22 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2021-03-22 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-03-19 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-03-19 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2021-02-14 (C) Draft On Hold
2020-12-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback