MT HB663 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revising school funding to increase GTB and lower property taxes
Title
Generally revising school funding to increase GTB and lower property taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-05-14 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-05-03 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-05-03 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-28 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2021-04-26 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-20 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2021-03-22 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-22 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-03-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-03-19 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-03-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-03-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2020-12-17 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-11-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |