MT HB640 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise marijuana laws
Title
Generally revise marijuana laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopt Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopt Motion Failed (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopt Motion Failed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-28 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Dissolved (S) Conference |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Conference Committee Dissolved (S) Conference |
2021-04-27 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference |
2021-04-27 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Dissolved (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-23 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred |
2021-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-13 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-04-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-03-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-03-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-03-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-03-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-03-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-03-12 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-03-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-03-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-03-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-03-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-03-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-03-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-03-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-09-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |