MT HB633 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for optional local interstate pipeline impact fee
Title
Provide for optional local interstate pipeline impact fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-03 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications |
2017-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology, and Federal Relations |
2017-03-21 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-03-21 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-03-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-03-15 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-03-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-03-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-14 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-03-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-05 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |