MT HB633 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an interim select committee on efficiency in government
Title
Provide for an interim select committee on efficiency in government
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ehli [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Failed in Legislature |
2013-05-10 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll in Progress |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Veto Override Vote Mail Poll Letter Being Prepared |
2013-05-06 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-25 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-25 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-23 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-03-25 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2013-03-21 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-21 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-02-28 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |