MT HB63 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise insurance laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise insurance laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - (H) Taken from 3rd Reading; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concur Motion Failed (Y: 27 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12 Chapter Number Assigned
2021-05-12House(H) Signed by Governor
2021-05-04House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2021-05-04Senate(S) Signed by President
2021-05-04House(H) Signed by Speaker
2021-04-29 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2021-04-29House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2021-04-26House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2021-04-26Senate(S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-26House(H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-26Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-04-26House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-04-26Senate(S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-26Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-26House(H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-04-26House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-23Senate(S) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference
2021-04-23Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Conference
2021-04-23House(H) Conference Committee Report Received (S) Conference
2021-04-23Senate(S) Hearing (S) Conference
2021-04-15Senate(S) Conference Committee Appointed (S) Conference
2021-04-14House(H) Conference Committee Appointed
2021-04-14House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concurred
2021-04-14House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-04-13House(H) Taken from 3rd Reading; Placed on 2nd Reading
2021-04-13House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-04-12House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Not Concur Motion Failed
2021-04-12House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-03-29Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2021-03-29Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2021-03-29Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-03-26Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2021-03-26Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-03-25Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-25 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-03-23Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-03-08Senate(S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-09Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-09Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-02-05Senate(S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-29Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
2021-01-29Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-28House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-01-28House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-28House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-27House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-01-27House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-25House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-22House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-21 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-08House(H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor
2021-01-06House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-06House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-01-05House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Business and Labor
2020-12-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor
2020-12-23House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2020-12-15House(H) Introduced
2020-12-15 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-12 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-11 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-11 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-10 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-07 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-12-03 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-12-03 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-09-15 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=63&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0099/HB0063_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0099/HB0063_2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0099/HB0063_3.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0099/HB0063_4.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0099/HB0063_X.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/FNPDF/HB0063_1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0063BUH210122.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H168&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H200&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0063BUS210209.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0063BUS210323.pdf
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1199&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1255&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1626&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2004&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1901&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2017&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1928&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1577&P_SESS=20211
Roll Callhttps://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1660&P_SESS=20211

Bill Comments 750

feedback