MT HB629 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow bioptic lens users to apply for driver's licenses
Title
Allow bioptic lens users to apply for driver's licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-04-02 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2019-03-22 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-19 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-18 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2019-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2019-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2019-03-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed (H) Transportation |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Transportation |
2019-02-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2019-02-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-02-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-02-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-02-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-02-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-02-15 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-02-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |