MT HB623 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to health care and health insurance
Title
Generally revise laws related to health care and health insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Motion Carried |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2013-04-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-28 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2013-03-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-25 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-03-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-22 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2013-03-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-03-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-03-15 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-11-23 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-11-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |