MT HB599 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment regarding vacancy for certain statewide offices
Title
Constitutional amendment regarding vacancy for certain statewide offices
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Skees [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) State Administration |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2017-04-03 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2017-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-23 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) State Administration |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2017-03-15 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-03-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-02-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-02-16 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-12-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |