MT HB597 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - (H) Fiscal Note Printed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise laws regarding big technology communication corporations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws regarding big technology communication corporations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-03-02 (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned
2021-03-02House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2021-03-01House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-02-26House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2021-02-24House(H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2021-02-24 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2021-02-23House(H) First Reading
2021-02-23House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2021-02-23House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2021-02-23House(H) Introduced
2021-02-23 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2021-02-23 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-02-23 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2021-02-23 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2021-02-22 (C) Draft in Assembly
2021-02-22 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-02-22 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-02-22 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-02-22 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-02-20 (C) Executive Director Review
2021-02-20 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2021-02-20 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2021-02-20 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2021-02-19 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2021-02-19 (C) Draft in Edit
2021-02-19 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2021-02-18 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2021-01-28 (C) Draft On Hold
2021-01-23 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback