MT HB588 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise personal staff limits for executive branch
Title
Revise personal staff limits for executive branch
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - (S) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Failed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) State Administration |
2021-03-29 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2021-03-26 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-03-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2021-03-08 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) State Administration |
2021-02-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-23 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-02-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-02-02 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-12-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |