MT HB587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for certified prescribed burning
Title
Provide for certified prescribed burning
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Shaw [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2017-03-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-03-10 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-09 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-03-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-03-07 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-03-01 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-02-17 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-02-17 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2017-01-27 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-11-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Agriculture
Fires and Fire Protection
Fish and Wildlife
Forests and Forestry
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Water
Fires and Fire Protection
Fish and Wildlife
Forests and Forestry
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Water
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=587&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0599/HB0587_1.pdf |