MT HB578 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Legalize blackjack and allocate proceeds
Title
Legalize blackjack and allocate proceeds
Sponsors
Rep. Wylie Galt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Failed (Y: 50 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2017-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Motion Failed |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Failed |
2017-03-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-03-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-14 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-08 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-03-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-03-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-03-01 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-01 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-02-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |