MT HB575 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise laws related to use of fishing access sites and wildlife management areas

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise laws related to use of fishing access sites and wildlife management areas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28House(H) Died in Standing Committee
2017-03-31House(H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
2017-03-21House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2017-03-14House(H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2017-03-14House(H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed
2017-03-10House(H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed
2017-03-10House(H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received
2017-03-09House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2017-03-08House(H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested
2017-03-07House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2017-03-07House(H) First Reading
2017-03-07House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2017-03-06 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2017-03-01House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2017-03-01House(H) Introduced
2017-02-27 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2017-02-27 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2017-02-27 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2017-02-27 (C) Draft in Assembly
2017-02-27 (C) Executive Director Review
2017-02-27 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2017-02-27 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2017-02-25 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2017-02-24 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2017-02-20 (C) Draft in Edit
2017-02-17 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2017-02-17 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2017-02-17 (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes
2017-02-15 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2017-02-13 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2017-02-13 (C) Fiscal Note Probable
2017-02-07 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2017-01-05 (C) Draft On Hold
2016-12-03 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback