MT HB574 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow business deductions for expenses reduced by federal credits
Title
Allow business deductions for expenses reduced by federal credits
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Hertz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-08 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Taxation |
2017-03-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2017-03-13 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2017-03-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-02-21 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-02-20 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-12-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |