MT HB516 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting local ordinances to state protected classes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting local ordinances to state protected classes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-22 - Senate - (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 (S) Died in Standing Committee
2011-04-01 (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Local Government
2011-03-22 (S) Taken from 2nd Reading; Rereferred to Committee (S) Local Government
2011-03-19 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2011-03-19 (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Local Government
2011-03-18 (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Local Government
2011-03-14 (S) Hearing (S) Local Government
2011-03-02 (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government
2011-03-02 (S) First Reading
2011-02-23 (H) Transmitted to Senate
2011-02-23 (H) 3rd Reading Passed
2011-02-23 (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2011-02-22 (H) 2nd Reading Passed
2011-02-22 (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2011-02-21 (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary
2011-02-21 (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary
2011-02-18 (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2011-02-12 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2011-02-12 (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2011-02-12 (H) First Reading
2011-02-12 (H) Introduced
2011-02-11 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2011-02-08 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2011-02-07 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2011-02-07 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2011-02-07 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2011-02-07 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2011-02-07 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2011-02-07 (C) Draft Back for Redo
2011-02-07 (C) Draft Taken by Drafter
2011-02-07 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2011-02-07 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2011-02-07 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
2011-02-05 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2011-02-05 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-02-05 (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes
2011-02-03 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-02-03 (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes
2011-02-02 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-02-02 (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes
2011-01-31 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2011-01-31 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2010-12-29 (C) Draft On Hold
2010-12-29 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback