MT HB49 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise recording fees to support county and state land information accounts
Title
Revise recording fees to support county and state land information accounts
Sponsors
Rep. David Bedey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - (S) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-07 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-02 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-02 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-29 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-03-26 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-03-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government |
2021-03-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Local Government |
2021-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Local Government |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Local Government |
2021-02-19 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Local Government |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Local Government |
2021-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2021-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-01-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-01-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-01-10 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Local Government |
2021-01-04 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Local Government |
2020-12-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2020-12-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2020-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-19 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-10-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-09-16 | (C) Draft Request Received |