MT HB467 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize securitization for energy infrastructure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize securitization for energy infrastructure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 77 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - (S) Energy and Telecommunications Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20 Chapter Number Assigned
2019-05-10House(H) Signed by Governor
2019-05-01House(H) Transmitted to Governor
2019-04-30Senate(S) Signed by President
2019-04-26House(H) Signed by Speaker
2019-04-25 (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available
2019-04-25House(H) Returned from Enrolling
2019-04-23House(H) Sent to Enrolling
2019-04-23House(H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate
2019-04-23House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-04-18House(H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred
2019-04-18House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-04-16Senate(S) Returned to House with Amendments
2019-04-16Senate(S) 3rd Reading Concurred
2019-04-16Senate(S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-04-15Senate(S) 2nd Reading Concurred
2019-04-15Senate(S) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
2019-04-15Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-04-13House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2019-04-12Senate(S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-04-10 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2019-04-10Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-04-09Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-28Senate(S) Hearing (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-23Senate(S) Hearing Canceled (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-12House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2019-03-11House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed
2019-03-11House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2019-03-09Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Energy and Telecommunications
2019-03-07Senate(S) First Reading
2019-03-01House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-01House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2019-03-01House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2019-02-28House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2019-02-28House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2019-02-27House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2019-02-26 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2019-02-26House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2019-02-25House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2019-02-21House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2019-02-20House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2019-02-20House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2019-02-18House(H) Hearing (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2019-02-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2019-02-13House(H) First Reading (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2019-02-13House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Energy, Technology and Federal Relations
2019-02-13House(H) Introduced
2019-02-13House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2019-02-12 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2019-02-12 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2019-02-12 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2019-02-11 (C) Draft in Assembly
2019-02-11 (C) Executive Director Review
2019-02-11 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2019-02-11 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2019-02-09 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2019-02-08 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
2019-02-07 (C) Draft in Edit
2019-02-06 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2018-12-22 (C) Draft On Hold
2018-12-22 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-12-21 (C) Draft On Hold
2018-12-20 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2018-12-07 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2018-11-30 (C) Draft On Hold
2018-11-28 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=467&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20191
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0499/HB0467_1.pdf
Texthttps://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/HB0499/HB0467_2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/house/votesheets/HB0467FEH190225.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H754&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H848&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://leg.mt.gov/bills/2019/minutes/senate/votesheets/HB0467ENS190409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1602&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=S1642&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H1972&P_SESS=20191
Roll Callhttp://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0211W$BLAC.VoteTabulation?P_VOTE_SEQ=H2006&P_SESS=20191

Bill Comments

feedback