MT HB463 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to asset forfeiture
Title
Revise laws related to asset forfeiture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-21 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-05-05 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-24 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-24 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2015-04-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-17 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-14 | Senate | (S) Rereferred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-04-11 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-04-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Judiciary |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-21 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-19 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-02 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-31 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-25 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-11-26 | (C) Draft Request Received |