MT HB46 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - (H) Transmitted to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revise special education funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise special education funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-03-02House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-03-02House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-03-01House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations
2021-03-01House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations
2021-03-01House(H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
2021-03-01House(H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2021-03-01House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-03-01House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-02-26 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2021-02-26House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education
2021-02-24House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education
2021-02-24House(H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Education
2021-01-26House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-26House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed
2021-01-26House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-21House(H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested
2021-01-20House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Education
2021-01-20House(H) Hearing (H) Education
2021-01-18 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-15House(H) Fiscal Note Printed
2021-01-15House(H) Fiscal Note Signed
2021-01-12House(H) Fiscal Note Received
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Education
2020-12-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Education
2020-12-23House(H) Fiscal Note Requested
2020-12-13House(H) Introduced
2020-12-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-02 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-02 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-11-30 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-11-30 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-11-19 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-11-18 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-10-27 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-08-13 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback