MT HB449 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of wages in workers' compensation insurance.
Title
Revise the definition of wages in workers' compensation insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Wylie Galt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-04 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-19 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2017-04-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2017-04-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-06 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-02-13 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-02-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-02-09 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-02-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-02-08 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2017-02-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft Request Received |