MT HB444 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide tax credit for access to state lands
Title
Provide tax credit for access to state lands
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-13 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-16 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-30 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-26 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-20 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-20 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Senate Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-18 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) Returned to House with Amendments |
2013-04-13 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-10 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Fish and Game |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-03-18 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2013-03-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-19 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2013-02-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2013-02-12 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-08 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-02-05 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-02-04 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-02-02 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-25 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2013-01-03 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |