MT HB404 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise education funding relating to oil and gas distribution
Title
Generally revise education funding relating to oil and gas distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Education |
2021-02-24 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-22 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2021-02-12 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |