MT HB390 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for homestead exemption for primary residences
Title
Provide for homestead exemption for primary residences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation |
2023-02-16 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-02-09 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-02-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-02-03 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-02-03 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-02-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-02-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-02-02 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-01-31 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-16 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2023-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |