MT HB385 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the Montana school safety act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the Montana school safety act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 44 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28House(H) Died in Process
2017-03-01House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2017-02-27House(H) 2nd Reading Not Passed
2017-02-27House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2017-02-24 (C) Printed - New Version Available
2017-02-24House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2017-02-24House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary
2017-02-14House(H) Hearing (H) Judiciary
2017-02-03House(H) First Reading
2017-02-03House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary
2017-02-02 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2017-02-02House(H) Introduced
2017-01-31 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2017-01-30 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2017-01-30 (C) Executive Director Final Review
2017-01-30 (C) Draft in Assembly
2017-01-30 (C) Executive Director Review
2017-01-30 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2017-01-30 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2017-01-28 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2017-01-28 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2017-01-27 (C) Draft in Edit
2017-01-26 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2017-01-25 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2017-01-24 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2016-12-27 (C) Draft Taken Off Hold
2016-11-18 (C) Draft On Hold
2016-09-06 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback