MT HB369 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws for courts of limited jurisdiction
Title
Revise laws for courts of limited jurisdiction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-02-05 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-31 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-30 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |