MT HB363 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws regarding default of student loans
Title
Revise laws regarding default of student loans
Sponsors
Rep. Moffie Funk [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-10 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-30 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-28 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Motion Failed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-26 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-03-19 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-06 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-02-13 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2015-01-30 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-27 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-26 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-01-21 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-21 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |