MT HB358 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - (H) Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise workers' compensation laws pertaining to release of information
Title
Revise workers' compensation laws pertaining to release of information
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Noland [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (H) Business and Labor Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | (H) Vetoed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Not Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Not Adopted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-07 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-03-28 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-27 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-03-27 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-03-24 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-03-22 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed Consideration |
2017-03-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-14 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-10 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Business and Labor |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Business and Labor |
2017-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2017-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-13 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-27 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-23 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |