MT HB346 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the tribal computer programming scholarship program
Title
Revise the tribal computer programming scholarship program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 23 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - Senate - (S) Education and Cultural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - (H) Education Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-18 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-04 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-04-29 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-26 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-19 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-04-12 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-04-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-03-31 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-03-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-03-18 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-03-18 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Education and Cultural Resources |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-03-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2023-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Education |
2023-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Education |
2023-02-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-02-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2023-02-03 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-27 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-01-27 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Education |
2023-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-26 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-01-26 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-24 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-20 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-12-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |