MT HB342 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Create SWAMP special revenue account
Title
Create SWAMP special revenue account
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-04-08 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-03-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-03-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-03-13 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-01-31 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-28 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft Request Received |