MT HB320 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit sales of federal land transferred to Montana
Title
Prohibit sales of federal land transferred to Montana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-04-16 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-04-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2021-02-23 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-19 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-15 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2021-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-04 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-02-04 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-02-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-02-01 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-12-02 | (C) Draft Request Received |