MT HB314 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase number of district court judges
Title
Increase number of district court judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2017-02-17 | House | (H) Bill Withdrawn per House Rule H30-50(3)(b) |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-31 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-25 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-12 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=314&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20171 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2017/hb0399/HB0314_1.pdf |