MT HB30 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provision on filling conservation district board vacancies
Title
Revise provision on filling conservation district board vacancies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2021-03-02 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2021-01-19 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration |
2021-01-07 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2021-01-04 | House | (H) First Reading (H) State Administration |
2020-12-24 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2020-12-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2020-12-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-11-30 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-11-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-11-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-11-17 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-11-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-11-09 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-10-13 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=30&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20211 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2021/HB0099/HB0030_1.pdf |