MT HB3 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Supplemental Appropriations Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental Appropriations Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-21 - Senate - (S) Finance and Claims Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-06 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-22Senate(S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims
2021-01-21Senate(S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (S) Finance and Claims
2021-01-19Senate(S) Hearing (S) Finance and Claims
2021-01-12Senate(S) Referred to Committee (S) Finance and Claims
2021-01-12Senate(S) First Reading
2021-01-11House(H) Transmitted to Senate
2021-01-11House(H) 3rd Reading Passed
2021-01-11House(H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading
2021-01-08House(H) 2nd Reading Passed
2021-01-08House(H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading
2021-01-07House(H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations
2021-01-06House(H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations
2021-01-05House(H) Hearing (H) Appropriations
2021-01-04 (C) Amendments Available
2021-01-04House(H) First Reading (H) Appropriations
2020-12-24House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Appropriations
2020-12-13House(H) Introduced
2020-12-13 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2020-12-06 (C) Draft in Assembly
2020-12-05 (C) Executive Director Review
2020-12-04 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2020-12-04 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2020-12-03 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2020-12-03 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
2020-11-25 (C) Draft in Edit
2020-11-23 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2020-09-18 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback