MT HB281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising laws related to how nonresident wolf licenses are issued
Title
Revising laws related to how nonresident wolf licenses are issued
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-07 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2019-04-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-10 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-09 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-03 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2019-03-26 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2019-03-21 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-23 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-02-20 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2019-01-29 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-23 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-23 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-19 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-01-16 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2019-01-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-12 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-11 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2019-01-09 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2019-01-07 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-12-22 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-12-04 | (C) Draft Request Received |