MT HB267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise laws related to bicycles on roadways
Title
Revise laws related to bicycles on roadways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed |
2017-03-13 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-07 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-01-30 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-01-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-01-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-01-26 | (C) Sponsors Engrossed | |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Transportation |
2017-01-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2017-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Transportation |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2017-01-17 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2016-12-29 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2016-12-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2016-12-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2016-12-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2016-12-23 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2016-12-23 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-19 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-15 | (C) Draft Request Received |