MT HB264 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise emergency vehicle passing laws
Title
Revise emergency vehicle passing laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - (S) Highways and Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Transportation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-29 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-20 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-13 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-04-13 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-04-08 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-08 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-04-07 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-25 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-09 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-03-09 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2021-03-08 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2021-03-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-27 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Transportation |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Transportation |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Transportation |
2021-02-13 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Transportation |
2021-02-01 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Transportation |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Transportation |
2021-01-27 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-27 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-27 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-27 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-24 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-23 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-20 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2021-01-15 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2020-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2020-12-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2020-12-15 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-11-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-10-29 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-10-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |