MT HB250 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying use of suppressed firearms to hunt certain wildlife is allowed
Title
Clarifying use of suppressed firearms to hunt certain wildlife is allowed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2015-04-23 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2015-04-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-04-16 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-14 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-04-14 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-04-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) Returned to House Concurred in Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate for Consideration of Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Governor's Proposed Amendments Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Returned with Governor's Proposed Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2015-03-16 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-13 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2015-03-13 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2015-03-11 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2015-03-09 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2015-02-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2015-02-12 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2015-02-07 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2015-02-07 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-02-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-02-04 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-01-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-01-31 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2015-01-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-01-19 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-15 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-14 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-31 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-16 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |