MT HB25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Use of validated tools for assessing needs of developmentally disabled persons
Title
Use of validated tools for assessing needs of developmentally disabled persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - (H) Human Services Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-03-13 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-03-11 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Public Health, Welfare and Safety |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-22 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-09 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2019-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Human Services |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-31 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-30 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2019-01-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2019-01-16 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Human Services |
2019-01-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Human Services |
2019-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2019-01-08 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2019-01-07 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Human Services |
2019-01-04 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2018-12-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Human Services |
2018-12-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2018-11-19 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-19 | House | (H) Introduced |
2018-11-13 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2018-11-13 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2018-11-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2018-11-12 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2018-10-23 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2018-10-22 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2018-10-12 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2018-10-08 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2018-10-08 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2018-09-14 | (C) Draft Request Received |