MT HB249 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a child tax credit for the individual income tax
Title
Create a child tax credit for the individual income tax
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Stafman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-01-31 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-01-26 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-01-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-01-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-01-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2023-01-16 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-01-16 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2023-01-13 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-01-12 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-01-12 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-10 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-07 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2023-01-02 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-22 | (C) Draft Request Received |