MT HB249 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revising laws related to presence of bison/buffalo on private property
Title
Revising laws related to presence of bison/buffalo on private property
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Doane [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Standing Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-28 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-21 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-20 | House | (H) Sponsor Rebuttal to Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-01-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-01-25 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Agriculture |
2013-01-24 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-01-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Agriculture |
2013-01-18 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Agriculture |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-16 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2012-12-31 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2012-12-27 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2012-12-26 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2012-12-17 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-12-14 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2012-12-04 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-30 | (C) Draft Request Received |