MT HB244 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - (S) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise death penalty laws related to lethal injection
Title
Revise death penalty laws related to lethal injection
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Lenz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | (S) Died in Process |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concur Motion Failed |
2021-04-15 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2021-04-01 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-16 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2021-02-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2021-02-03 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2021-01-28 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2021-01-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-26 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-26 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2021-01-19 | (C) Draft Request Received |