MT HB242 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a muzzleloader heritage hunt season
Title
Establishing a muzzleloader heritage hunt season
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - (S) Fish and Game Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2021-04-15 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2021-04-01 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-31 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2021-03-31 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2021-03-25 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2021-03-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2021-03-16 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred (S) Fish and Game |
2021-03-09 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Fish and Game |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Fish and Game |
2021-02-12 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2021-02-11 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2021-02-05 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2021-02-04 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2021-02-03 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2021-02-02 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2021-01-26 | House | (H) First Reading |
2021-01-26 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2021-01-25 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-25 | House | (H) Introduced |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2021-01-25 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2021-01-22 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2021-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2021-01-08 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2021-01-05 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2021-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2020-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-21 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2020-12-11 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2020-12-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2020-12-01 | (C) Draft Request Received |