MT HB236 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Generally revise laws related to release of information by law enforcement
Title
Generally revise laws related to release of information by law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 45 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-01 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2017-03-01 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2017-02-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-01 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-25 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-18 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-14 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2017-01-13 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-12 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2017-01-11 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-14 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-12-12 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2016-12-09 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-12-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |